Whisnant v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Brian Whisnant
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2011cv05591
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Stipulation as to Standard of Review.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 12 Stipulation Selecting ADR Process.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/23/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whisnant v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whisnant
Represented By: Charles B. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?