Krishan Corporation et al v. Patel
Defendant: Pankaj K. Patel
Miscellaneous: Office of the U.S. Trustee/SJ, US Bankruptcy Court and Judge Arthur S. Weissbrodt
Appellant: Krishan Corporation
Appellee: Days Inns Worldwide Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv05705
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss Appeal. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/8/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ISSUING ALTERNATIVE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The OSC issued 4/18/2012 is DISCHARGED. Appellant shall file a brief declaration in response to this OSC detailing the efforts made to secure the record and providing any other pertinent information on or before 5/25/2012. If Appellant does not file a response as directed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Appellant does not file a response to this order to show cause by 5/3/2012 demonstrating why the case should not be dismissed, the Court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krishan Corporation et al v. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pankaj K. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Office of the U.S. Trustee/SJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: US Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Judge Arthur S. Weissbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Krishan Corporation
Represented By: Steven Jude Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Days Inns Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey V. Commisso
Represented By: Nicole Sherry Magaline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?