Voudouris v. Tomy Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: John C Voudouris
Defendant: Pyramid Orthodontics, Inc and Tomy Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2011cv05726
Filed: November 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER, re 34 Order to File Stipulation of Dismissal filed by John C Voudouris. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH A COURT ORDER. Show Cause Response due by 5/17/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/28/2013 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 13, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Jon S. Tigar. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the Case Management Statement filed by Defendant Pyramid Orthodontics, Inc. (see Docket Item No. 27 ), the court finds that a Case Management Conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the conference scheduled for December 14, 2012, is VACATED. The parties are ordered to comply with the deadlines contained in the scheduling order filed June 7, 2012. See Docket Item No. 24 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/12/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voudouris v. Tomy Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyramid Orthodontics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomy Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Voudouris
Represented By: Frank T Carroll
Represented By: Seth A Kramer
Represented By: Joseph F Posillico
Represented By: Phillip Francis Shinn
Represented By: Tyreen Grissel Torner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?