Reignierd et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Christopher Reignierd and Saeko Reignierd
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2011cv05750
Filed: November 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on September 4, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 24 Motion to Continue (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER 22 Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2012. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/15/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 9 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on March 16, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 7 extending time for defendant to respond to complaint. Defendant's response to complaint due by 1/20/2012. The initial case management conference is continued to 4/10/2012, 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/10/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reignierd et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Reignierd
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Reymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saeko Reignierd
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Reymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?