Zoove Corporation v. Starpound Corporation
Plaintiff: Zoove Corporation
Defendant: Starpound Corporation
Case Number: 5:2011cv06131
Filed: December 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order Granting 65 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/16/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING re 56 Letter filed by Starpound Corporation to participate by phone for the meet and confer. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/21/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 15 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/17/12. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoove Corporation v. Starpound Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoove Corporation
Represented By: William Frederick Abrams
Represented By: Carlos Patricio Mino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starpound Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?