Harris et al v. CBS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: William L Harris and Jean Harris
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv00049
Filed: January 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION TO BIFURCATE re 131 Stipulation filed by CBS Corporation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 117 MOTION to Bifurcate Punitive Damages Claim. Responses due by 12/26/2012. Replies due by 1/2/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER RE: 128 MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS. The court finds that it is appropriately treated as an administrative motion rather than as a noticed motion. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition or notice of non-opposition to the administrative motion on or before 12/28/2012 at which time it will be deemed submitted for decision. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/20/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to ADR Local Rule 7-2, this action is referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for a settlement conference to occur no later than 1/18/2013. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Cousins' courtroom deputy to arrange a date for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 121 Stipulation Re: Plaintiffs' Filing of First Amended Complaint filed by Jean Harris, William L Harris. Answer due December 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/10/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION TO APPLY IDAHO LAW. Motion due by 11/16/2012.Opposition due by 11/26/2012. Reply due by 12/3/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING 106 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed by CBS Corporation, ***12/7/2012 Motion Hearing/Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated: 100 AMENDED MOTION to Apply Idaho Law re 99 Notice (Other) filed by CBS Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges, Sr. Judge denying 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wthlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Granting 62 Motion for Relief from reply brief page limits; Denying 61 Motion to Strike Defendant's reply brief and all evidence and arguments submitted for the first time therewith; granting 61 Motion requesting leave to file exces s pages. Accordingly, the court DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to strike the evidence and arguments submitted for the first time therewith and GRANTS Plaintiffs' request to file a reply with leave to file excess pages, not to exceed 25 pages. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's reply brief in support of its Rule 12(b) motion to dismiss, as filed at its current length of 25 pages, shall be considered by the court in its entirety, along with all evidence and arguments submitted for the first time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a reply to Defendant's reply within 14 days of the date of this order, not to exceed 25 pages of fact and argument. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2012 (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012) Modified text on 4/23/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement and proposed schedule, the court finds that a Case Management Conference would be premature at this time. Accordingly, the 4/6/2012 Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 8/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. CBS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L Harris
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Francis Ernest Fernandez
Represented By: Gregg Aaron Myers
Represented By: Matthew Louis Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Harris
Represented By: Francis Ernest Fernandez
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Gregg Aaron Myers
Represented By: Matthew Louis Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?