Sager v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ron Sager
Defendant: Soundbite Communications, Inc and Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv00197
Filed: January 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER 45 for Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/13/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 34 Motion for Permission to Efile.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER 41 to Stay Case. Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/8/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER 30 Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant Bank of America Corporation's and Defendant Soundbite Communications, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/28/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER 20 Selecting ADR Process, Case Referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/2/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sager v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soundbite Communications, Inc
Represented By: Mazda Kersey Antia
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Jordan Seungjin Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Sager
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Suzanne Beckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?