Smith et al v. Intuit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tasha Smith and Fredierick Smith
Defendant: Intuit, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv00222
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order granting 96 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on Oct. 1, 2013.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RE: JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. All previously-ordered deadlines are STAYED pending further order of the court. The motion hearing previously scheduled for April 19, 2013, is VACATED. The hearing date for the anticipated Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement shall be May 24, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed no later than 30 day of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/10/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE PARTIES' PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Tasha Smith, Fredierick Smith. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 24, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Joint 61 Stipulation to Modify ADR Schedule. The Deadline for the Parties to participated in private ADR is extended to 11/2/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/12/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR Defendant Intuit Inc. to Respond to Complaint re 22 Stipulation filed by Intuit, Inc. Response due 3/19/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/8/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Intuit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Smith
Represented By: Richard M Golomb
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates
Represented By: M. Ryan Casey
Represented By: Kenneth J. Grunfeld
Represented By: Ruben Honik
Represented By: Brian T Ku
Represented By: Isaac Miller
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredierick Smith
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates
Represented By: M. Ryan Casey
Represented By: Richard M Golomb
Represented By: Kenneth J. Grunfeld
Represented By: Ruben Honik
Represented By: Brian T Ku
Represented By: Isaac Miller
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit, Inc.
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?