Villa v. United Site Services of California, Inc
Plaintiff: Jose B. Lezama Duarte, Nelson Gonzalez Villa and Juan P Arjon
Defendant: United Site Services of California, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv00318
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 4/16/2014. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Directing Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 10, 2014. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying without prejudice 167 Motion for Settlement (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER extending time to file Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement by September 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/16/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER to Withdraw Pending Motions re 159 Notice (Other) filed by United Site Services of California, Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 15, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Continuing Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 26, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Directing Parties to File a Joing Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 21, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Continuing Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 3, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 153 .
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 146 OPPOSED MOTION Invalidate Opt-Out Settlement Agreements and for Corrective Notice filed by Nelson Gonzalez Villa. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 22, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 136 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 130 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh re 122 Motion for Clarification (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Certify Class; denying 99 Motion to Strike (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/22/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 40 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 38 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 36 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villa v. United Site Services of California, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Site Services of California, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose B. Lezama Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Gonzalez Villa
Represented By: Fernando Fabela Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan P Arjon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?