Pavlina v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Pavlina, Jr.
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2012cv00534
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 31 Motion to Continue.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/5/2012. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 10 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pavlina v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Pavlina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kevin Grier McCurdy
Represented By: Bruce Gardiner McKleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?