Innovus Prime, LLC v. Panasonic Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Innovus Prime, LLC
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America and Panasonic Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv00660
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 64 Motion to Strike (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 58 Ex Parte Application(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER 38 Selecting ADR Process. Case Referred to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/21/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CLARIFYING PARTIES' REQUIREMENTS RE SCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on September 12, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S RULE 56(D) MOTION by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/19/12. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovus Prime, LLC v. Panasonic Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovus Prime, LLC
Represented By: John Wade Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?