BoomerangIt, Inc., v. ID Armor, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: |
BoomerangIt, Inc., |
Defendant: |
ID Armor, Inc., and Ignite Media Solitions, LLC., |
Case Number: |
5:2012cv00920 |
Filed: |
February 23, 2012 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Alameda |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward J. Davila |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION AND ORDER Changing Time and Order Thereon re 31 Stipulation filed by BoomerangIt, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/19/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing
27
Order by Hon. Edward J. Davila denying 24 Motion for TRO.(ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing
7
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR IGNITE MEDIA SOLUTIONS, LLC TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re 6 Stipulation. Response due 3/28/2012. Motions terminated: 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and Motion to Shorten Time for Motion filed by Ignite Media Solitions, LLC., ID Armor, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/19/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: BoomerangIt, Inc., v. ID Armor, Inc., et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: BoomerangIt, Inc., |
Represented By: |
Stuart James West |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: ID Armor, Inc., |
Represented By: |
Jennifer L. Ishimoto |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ignite Media Solitions, LLC., |
Represented By: |
Jennifer L. Ishimoto |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?