Sunnergren v. Cate
Plaintiff: Mark E. Sunnergren
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Case Number: 5:2012cv00979
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 11/2/2015. No further filings will be accepted in this closed case. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/25/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 58 MOTION DEFENDANT C. LACY, L.V.N.S REQUEST FOR EXCUSED PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by E. Tootell, J. Grant, Carolyn Lacy, J. Espinoza-Marcus, Wu. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/29/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 WRIT of habeas corpus issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 7/1/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Vacating Status Conference and Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/19/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/5/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference in Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Program. Amended as to date (year) of telephonic status conference and order stamp. Signed by Judge Nandor J Vadas on 4/21/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff shall file an opposition within twenty-eight (28) days of the filing date of this order. Plaintiff shall file a reply within fourteen days thereafter. Additionally, Plaintiff may fie his opposition in two parts, provided that each part is clearly indicated as being on of two part. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/7/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunnergren v. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Sunnergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?