Johnson-v-CFS II, Inc
Plaintiff: Bruce Albert Johnson
Defendant: CFS II, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv01091
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Attorney Fees (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 69 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER VACATING HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/17/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
April 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 57 Stipulation Re Settlement Negotiations.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Re: Status Report Regarding Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/22/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Directing Parties to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/16/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Continuing Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/01/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
February 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Continuing Hearings. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/18/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Directing Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/1/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Status Report. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/6/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 20 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 22 Letter filed by CFS II, Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/18/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson-v-CFS II, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFS II, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Albert Johnson
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?