Softvault Systems, Inc v. Sybase, Inc.
Plaintiff: Softvault Systems, Inc
Defendant: Sybase, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01099
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN CASE 14-CV-03215-LHK; 14-CV-03223-LHK; 14-CV-03221-LHK; 14-CV-03222-LHK; 14-CV-03212-LHK; 14-CV-01164.. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/8/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES ON SEPTEMEBER 10, 2014 IN 14-CV-01164-LHK; 14-CV-03215-LHK; 14-CV-03223-LHK; 14-CV-03221-LHK; 14-CV-03222-LHK; 14-CV-03212-LHK. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/4/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/10/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/17/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting motion to withdraw 13 Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/26/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:12-cv-01099-LHK; granting (42) Stipulationof Dismissal of Novell in case 5:12-cv-05541-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:12-cv-05541-LHK, 5:12-cv-01099-LHK, 5:12-cv-05546-LHK, 5:13-cv-00751-LHK, 5:13-cv-00752-LHK, 5:13-cv-00754-LHK(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Continuing Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 7, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:12-cv-01099-LHK; granting (25) Stipulation to Modify Schedule in case 5:12-cv-05546-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:12-cv-05546-LHK, 5:12-cv-01099-LHK, 5:12-cv-05541-LHK, 5:13-cv-00751-LHK, 5:13-cv-00752-LHK, 5:13-cv-00754-LHK(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 69 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/7/2012. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:12-cv-01099-LHK; granting (38) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:12-cv-01658-LHK. Cases 12-cv-05541, 12-cv-05544 and 12-cv-05524 are related to these cases (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 62 Notice (Other) filed by Softvault Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/1/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 38 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 40 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 24 Stipulation selecting Private ADR (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/9/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 16 Motion to Relate Case. Case 12-cv-01658 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Softvault Systems, Inc v. Sybase, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Softvault Systems, Inc
Represented By: Edward W. Goldstein
Represented By: Todd Blumenfeld
Represented By: Alisa A Lipski
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Represented By: Jonathan T. Suder
Represented By: Corby R. Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sybase, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M Beauchamp
Represented By: Jane Louise Froyd
Represented By: Tharan Gregory Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?