Williams v. Castillo et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Williams
Defendant: SVSP Maintenance Staff, Machuca, Mejia, Tovar, Curry, Ceja, Rodriquez, Beattle, Ceballos and Castillo
Case Number: 5:2012cv01116
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER 110 to Withdraw ECF Nos. 105 and 106. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/5/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/7/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/25/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conferenceSigned by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 5/5/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting in Part and Denying in Part 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; Referring Case to Pro Se Prisoner Settlement Program. Case Referred to Judge Vadas. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 75 Motion for Default Judgment Against All Defendants for Failure to Defend. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 51 Second Motion to Change Time to File Dispositive Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Motion to Reconsider; ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/11/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/4/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Castillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVSP Maintenance Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tovar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceballos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?