Brown et al v. Vericrest Financial, Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Sharon R Brown
Defendant: Vericrest Financial, Inc. and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv01152
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER 51 to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/30/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER 49 Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/9/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 25 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER 37 Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Hearing and Scheduling Conference: Status Conference set for 11/30/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/1/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER 34 to Continue the Case Management Conference; and to Continue the Motion by Defendant Citimortgage, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/23/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FURTHER STIPULATION AND ORDER 22 to Extend Time for Citimortgage, Inc. to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/19/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Vericrest Financial, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vericrest Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Lida Sparer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Elijah Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon R Brown
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?