North Coast Medical, Inc. v. Danmic Global, LLC et al
Plaintiff: North Coast Medical, Inc.
Defendant: Danmic Global, LLC, Jorgen Michael Jensen, Christy Manufacturing Corporation, LLC, George Michael Christy and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 5:2012cv01246
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 9, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE: FILING OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 18, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** ORDER DISMISSING GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING, INC., AURORA BANK FSB, AURORA LOAN SERVICES, LLC, AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AKERMAN SENTERFITT, LLP, TAYLOR L. BROADHEAD, AND JUSTIN D. BALSER; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 3, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013) Modified on 1/3/2013 (lhklc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/3/2013 (lhklc1, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/10/2012. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 6, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 39 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 13 stipulation to file an amended complaint; Order re 6 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/14/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Coast Medical, Inc. v. Danmic Global, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Coast Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Kit L. Knudsen
Represented By: David H.S. Commins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danmic Global, LLC
Represented By: Stuart C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorgen Michael Jensen
Represented By: Stuart C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Manufacturing Corporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Michael Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?