Franczak v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bernie Franczak
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01453
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss; denying 47 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Since this result constitutes a final resolution of the case, judgment will be entered in favor of Defendant. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/5/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay response Deadline to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pending Amended Complaint Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend re 40 Stipulation filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 35 , 36 Motions to Appear by Telephone. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 3/22/2013. The hearing scheduled for 3/8/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order as Modified Granting 31 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadline and Pretrial Hearing Dates. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 12/6/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE: RESETTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant shall re-file and re-notice the Motion to Dismiss according to Civil Local Rule 7 after obtaining a hearing date for the motion from the undersigneds Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/28/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Proceedings Pending Loan Modification Review filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. Stay up to and including 1/9/2013. The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for 9/21/2012 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franczak v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Evan Chvat
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernie Franczak
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Jessica Hollenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?