Viasphere International , Inc v. Vardaryan
Plaintiff: Viasphere International , Inc
Defendant: Aram Vardaryan
Case Number: 5:2012cv01536
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 284 Viasphere's Motion to Enforce Judgment; denying as moot 291 defendant's Motion to Appear by Telephone. 5/16/2017 motion hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 259 Vardanyan's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 261 Vardanyan's Motion for Temporary Stay of Execution of Judgment. Vardanyan to post $387,000 security by 9/17/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 250 Viasphere International, Inc.'s Motion to Alter Judgment. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW RE: RESCISSION CLAIM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/30/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON EQUITABLE CLAIMS FOR RELIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/4/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER re 196 for Use of Electronic Equipment During Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/12/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re Parties' Objections to Proposed Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/10/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 149 plaintiff's administrative request to re-set trial dates. Final Pretrial Conference re-set for 5/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Parties further pretrial submissions due at least one week prior to pretrial conference. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 5/19/2014 in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Jury Trial set for 5/20/2014, 5/21/2014, 5/22/2014, 5/23/2014, and 5/27/2014 in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/3/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re Parties' Motions in Limine 128 , 129 , 131 , 136 , and 137 . (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Directing the Parties to Participate in Mediation. Parties shall immediately schedule their private mediation, with the mediation to take place prior to the 1/30/2014 pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/21/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd terminating (55) Vardanyan's Ex Parte Application; granting (57) Vardanyan's Motion for Reconsideration; denying (60) plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions in case 5:12-cv-01536-HRL; denying (27) defendants' Motion for Sanctions in case 5:12-cv-05645-HRL. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Nominating Special Master: Hon. Kevin J. Murphy of ADR Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/30/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 65 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 53 Amended Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 INTERIM ORDER re (48 in 5:12-cv-01536-HRL) Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/16/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 19 defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. 9/11/2012 motion hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Motion to dismiss granted in part and denied in part with leave to amend. Amended pleading due within 14 days from the date of this order. Initial case management conference continued to 8/14/2012, 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, and related deadlines are adjusted accordingly.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing re 3 defendant's motion to dismiss. Matter deemed submitted without oral argument. 5/29/2012 hearing vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/21/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viasphere International , Inc v. Vardaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viasphere International , Inc
Represented By: Stephen Donald Pahl
Represented By: Helene Anastasia Simvoulakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aram Vardaryan
Represented By: Ara Aroustamian
Represented By: Varand Vartanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?