P. et al v. Health Net of California, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott P. and A. P.
Defendant: Health Net of California, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01666
Filed: April 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 28 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 25, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Ex Parte Application.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P. et al v. Health Net of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott P.
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?