Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv01669
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2012 Filing 45 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 44 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:11-cv-01843. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 27, 2012 Filing 43 TRANSFER to the District of Northern District of California. (LAK)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California. This cause is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines and immediately transfer this cause to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/26/2012. (BGS)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. Directions to counsel in preparation of the Case Management and Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/21/2012. (LAK)
March 12, 2012 Filing 40 REPLY to response to motion re 28 MOTION to transfer case to the Northern District of California and Memorandum in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Zaffuto, Warren)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER granting 38 Motion for leave to file reply. Defendant is granted leave to file a reply in support of its Motion to Transfer Venue. The reply shall be filed within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS and is limited to five pages in length. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/27/2012. (BGS)
February 24, 2012 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Zaffuto, Warren)
February 22, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC re 28 MOTION to transfer case to the Northern District of California and Memorandum in Support, 35 Response in opposition to motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Opposition to Cisco's Motion to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Declaration of VanderZanden, # 3 Exhibit 2A, # 4 Exhibit 2B, # 5 Exhibit 2C, # 6 Exhibit 2D, # 7 Exhibit 2E, # 8 Exhibit 2F, # 9 Exhibit 2G, # 10 Exhibit 2H, # 11 Exhibit 2I, # 12 Exhibit 2J, # 13 Exhibit 2K, # 14 Exhibit 2L, # 15 Exhibit 2M, # 16 Exhibit 2N, # 17 Exhibit 2O, # 18 Exhibit 2P, # 19 Exhibit 2Q, # 20 Exhibit 2R, # 21 Exhibit 2S, # 22 Exhibit 2T, # 23 Exhibit 2U, # 24 Exhibit 2V, # 25 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Gordon Bremer)(Hill, Christopher)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 33 Motion to extend time. Counsel are directed to appear at a case management and scheduling conference scheduled on 3/29/12 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Judge Charlene Edward Honeywell and Magistrate Judge David A. Baker in Courtroom 5B, 401 West Central Blvd. Orlando, FL Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/21/2012. (AKJ)
February 21, 2012 Filing 35 RESPONSE in opposition re 28 MOTION to transfer case to the Northern District of California and Memorandum in Support filed by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1A, # 3 Exhibit 1B, # 4 Exhibit 1C, # 5 Exhibit 1D, # 6 Exhibit 1E, # 7 Exhibit 1F, # 8 Exhibit 1G, # 9 Exhibit 1H, # 10 Exhibit 1I, # 11 Exhibit 1J, # 12 Exhibit 1K, # 13 Exhibit 1L, # 14 Exhibit 1M, # 15 Exhibit 1N, # 16 Exhibit 1O, # 17 Exhibit 1P, # 18 Exhibit 1Q, # 19 Exhibit 1R, # 20 Exhibit 1S, # 21 Exhibit 1T, # 22 Exhibit 2)(Hill, Christopher)
February 21, 2012 Set/reset hearings: Miscellaneous Hearing - Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2012 at02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Judge David A. Baker. (AKJ)
February 15, 2012 Filing 34 ANSWER to 27 Counterclaim by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC. Related document: 27 Answer to complaintCounterclaim filed by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Hill, Christopher) Text modified on 2/16/2012 (RDO).
February 14, 2012 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to extend time to hold Case Management Meeting and File Case Management Report and for Authorization to Conduct the Meeting Telephonically by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC. (Hill, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting 31 Motion to meet telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/10/2012. (Baker, David)
February 9, 2012 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to allow Telephonic Conference to prepare Case Management Report by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Zaffuto, Warren)
February 7, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Joseph A. Powers appearing on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $10.00 receipt number ORL-14379.) Related document: 29 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph A. Powers to appear pro hac vice. (MAA)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 motion to appear pro hac vice. Provided, all counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. After this Order, the Clerk will no longer send copies of docket entries by U.S. Mail to counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/6/2012. (Baker, David)
February 3, 2012 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph A. Powers to appear pro hac vice by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of Joseph A. Powers)(Zaffuto, Warren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
February 3, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION to transfer case to the Northern District of California and Memorandum in Support by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration of David C. Dotson, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- Declaration of Andrea Maccato)(Zaffuto, Warren) Modified on 2/6/2012 (SR).
January 25, 2012 Filing 27 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Zaffuto, Warren)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting 24 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting 25 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 1/23/2012. (LAK)
January 19, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney L. Norwood Jameson appearing on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $10.00 receipt number ORL-13858.) Related document: 23 Unopposed MOTION for L. Norwood Jameson to appear pro hac vice. (MAA)
January 15, 2012 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew C. Gaudet to appear pro hac vice by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of Matthew C. Gaudet in Support of Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Zaffuto, Warren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed/paid on 1/10/12***(IGC).
January 15, 2012 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for David C. Dotson to appear pro hac vice by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of David C. Dotson in Support of Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Zaffuto, Warren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed/paid on 1/10/12*** (IGC).
January 15, 2012 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for L. Norwood Jameson to appear pro hac vice by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of L. Norwood Jameson in Support of Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Zaffuto, Warren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
January 10, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Matthew C. Gaudet appearing on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number ORL-13604.) Related document: 19 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew C. Gaudet to appear pro hac vice. (MAA)
January 10, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David C. Dotson appearing on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $10.00, receipt number ORL13604) Related document: 20 Unopposed MOTION for David C. Dotson to appear pro hac vice (IGC)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice 19 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice 20 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 1/10/2012. (LAK)
January 10, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 8 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Zaffuto, Warren)
January 9, 2012 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for David C. Dotson to appear pro hac vice by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of David C. Dotson in Support of Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Zaffuto, Warren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
January 9, 2012 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew C. Gaudet to appear pro hac vice by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of Matthew C. Gaudet in Support of Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Zaffuto, Warren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
December 22, 2011 Set/reset deadlines/hearings for Cisco Systems, Inc.. Answer due by 1/25/2012. (SR)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 12/22/2011. (Baker, David)
December 21, 2011 Filing 17 Agreed MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead as to 1 Complaint by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Gurland, Harvey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Modified on 12/22/2011 (SR).
December 21, 2011 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Gurland, Harvey)
December 21, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey W. Gurland, Jr on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Gurland, Harvey)
December 20, 2011 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Charlene E. Honeywell per #1 Order, case 6:11-mc-133-Orl-22. New case number: 6:11-cv-1843-Orl-36DAB. Judge Mary S. Scriven no longer assigned to the case. (LAM)
December 16, 2011 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:11-cv-1843-35DAB. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (SR)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER transferring case to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/15/2011. (LAK)
December 15, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 8 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Hill, Christopher) Modified on 12/15/2011 (SR).
December 14, 2011 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12/5/11 by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC as to Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hill, Christopher)
December 13, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Return of Service by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 A)(Hill, Christopher) Modified on 12/14/2011 (SR). *ATTORNEY ADVISED TO REFILE AS A RETURN OF SERVICE*
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2.The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. The Case Management Report shall be filed under event code "Motion for Entry of Case Management Report Scheduling Order." Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/12/2011. (NBL) copies e-mailed
December 7, 2011 Filing 7 Case reassigned to Judge Mary S. Scriven. New case number: 6:11-cv-1843-Orl-35KRS. Judge John Antoon II no longer assigned to the case. (SR)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Mary S. Scriven, with her permission, to be considered with 6:11-cv-1840-MSS/KRS. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/6/2011. (BRS)
December 2, 2011 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC. (Hill, Christopher)
December 2, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Hill, Christopher) Modified on 12/5/2011 (SR). Modified on 12/12/2011 (SR).***ATTORNEY NOTIFIED DOCUMENT CONTAINS DIFFERENT CASE NUMBER***
November 29, 2011 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc. (MAA)
November 21, 2011 Filing 2 Patent Report sent electronically to Alexandria, VA. (MAA) Modified on 11/21/2011 (MAA). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2011: # 1 Complaint, Exhibits & Civl Cover Sheet) (MAA).
November 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cisco Systems, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ORL012367) filed by Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(CBH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Baker
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: Brent David Rafferty
Represented By: Lei Sun
Represented By: Brian Henzler VanderZanden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc
Represented By: David C. Dotson
Represented By: Matthew C. Gaudet
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Represented By: L. Norwood Jameson
Represented By: Joseph A. Powers
Represented By: Richard L. Seabolt
Represented By: Warren Daniel Zaffuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?