McFarland v. County of Santa Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Shannon McFarland
Defendant: Bruce McFarland, Christopher Hankes, John Habermehl, County of Santa Cruz, Phil Wowak and William Gazza
Case Number: 5:2012cv01727
Filed: April 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Dismissing the Case and Vacating 49 Order on Motion to Remand (rmwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER 44 to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Defendant County of Santa Cruz. County of Santa Cruz terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/9/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER 29 Re: Continuance of Mediation Date. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/13/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/5/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. County of Santa Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hankes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Habermehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Wowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon McFarland
Represented By: Andrew Blake Kreeft
Represented By: Robert Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?