Maxwell v. Unilever United States, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Maxwell
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc., Unilever Supply Chain, Inc. and PEPSICO, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01736
Filed: April 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DENYING 136 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING 123 DEFENDANT PEPSICO, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Clerk shall administratively close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018) (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court hereby issues an order to show cause why this action should not be stayed under the primary jurisdiction doctrine. If the parties do not, by 4/6/2016, demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be so stayed, the court will enter such an order. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 and 67 Motions to Dismiss, Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 08/28/2014 (ejdlc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE: STATEMENTS OF RECENT DECISION. The parties to this action shall not file any further Statements of Recent Decision with regard to the currently pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/26/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 63 Stipulation filed by Pepsi Lipton Tea Partnership, Unilever United States, Inc. Deadline to respond up to and including June 12, 2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/2/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting 37 Motion to Dismiss. If Plaintiffs wish to file an amended complaint, the Court orders that it be pleaded in compliance with the pleading standards of Rules 8 and 9 and filed within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/9/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013) Modified on 4/9/2013 (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Amy Maxwell. Unilever Supply Chain, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/10/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Unilever United States, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Maxwell
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: John W. (Don) Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Ananda N. Chaudhuri
Represented By: J. Price Coleman
Represented By: Keith M. Fleischman
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Frank Karam
Represented By: Dewitt Marshall Lovelace, Sr.
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Carol Nelkin
Represented By: Jay P. Nelkin
Represented By: Stuart M Nelkin
Represented By: Katherine B. Riley
Represented By: David Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever Supply Chain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEPSICO, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy William Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?