Johnson v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Johnson
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv01851
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 20 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/22/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 32 Stipulation.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 10 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?