Titan Global, LLC et al v. Organo Gold Int'l, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Rasmussen, Mathew Rasmussen and Titan Global, LLC
Defendant: Organo Gold Int'l, Inc, Holton Buggs, Jr., Romacio Fulcher, Jane Doe Buggs, Rramon Fulcher, Sr, Tyra Fulcher, Kyle A Solon, Does, John 1-25, Does, Jane 1-25, Does, John 26-50, Does, Jane 26-50 and XYZ Corporation and LLC , 1-25
Case Number: 5:2012cv02104
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING 81 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; DENYING AS MOOT 73 MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING AS MOOT 78 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 64 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 55 Notice (Other) filed by Tyra Fulcher, Romacio Fulcher, Rramon Fulcher, Sr, Kyle A Solon. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/2/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/13/2012. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/18/2012. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 33 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Titan Global, LLC et al v. Organo Gold Int'l, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rasmussen
Represented By: David Griffith Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Rasmussen
Represented By: David Griffith Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titan Global, LLC
Represented By: David Griffith Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organo Gold Int'l, Inc
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holton Buggs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romacio Fulcher
Represented By: Alex James Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Buggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rramon Fulcher, Sr
Represented By: Alex James Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Fulcher
Represented By: Alex James Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle A Solon
Represented By: Alex James Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does, John 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does, Jane 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does, John 26-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does, Jane 26-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation and LLC , 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?