J&J Sports Productions, Inc v. Bonilla et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Defendant: Fredis Noel Bonilla and Choice Groups Enterprise, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv02243
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Motion for Default Judgment.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Continuing Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/22/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/8/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 12 Ex Parte Application to Continue Case Management Conference.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Staying Case as to Defendant Fredis Noel Bonilla; and Continuing Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/19/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc v. Bonilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredis Noel Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Groups Enterprise, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?