Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Gulparast et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Farah Gulparast and Cindy Swanson
Case Number: 5:2012cv02528
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2014. Order to Show Cause Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/22/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed Plaintiff's Case Management Statement, the court finds that a scheduling conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for December 13, 2013, is CONTINUED to January 24, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before January 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/10/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/24/2014 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/17/2014. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/31/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PRETRIAL ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 1/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/8/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Jury Deliberations set for 1/23/2014 to 1/24/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/17/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO HOLD PRIVATE MEDIATION re 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Cindy Swanson filed by Cindy Swanson. The parties have agreed to participate in mediation with Hon. James C . Emerson (Ret.) no later than March 25, 2013. Motions terminated: 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Cindy Swanson filed by Cindy Swanson. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/11/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Edward J. Davila. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Gulparast et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Susan Deann Condon
Represented By: Valerie Margo Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farah Gulparast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?