The Estate of Buckminster Fuller v. Maxfield & Oberton Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: The Estate of Buckminster Fuller
Defendant: Maxfield & Oberton Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv02570
Filed: May 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Directing Parties to File Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 24, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 44 Motion to Intervene.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALL re 37 Notice (Other), filed by Maxfield & Oberton Holdings, LLC. Cousel to arrange telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/20/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 12 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 9 Motion to Continue (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Buckminster Fuller v. Maxfield & Oberton Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Buckminster Fuller
Represented By: Thomas A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxfield & Oberton Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?