Lanovaz v. Twinings North America, Inc
Plaintiff: Nancy Lanovaz
Defendant: Twinings North America, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv02646
Filed: May 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting 200 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 206 Motion to Strike. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Following In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/13/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER re 137 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/11/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SECOND INTERIM ORDER re In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/20/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 180 Motion for Reconsideration re 177 Order on Motion for Leave to File; 46 Order on Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 167 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs brief due March 13, 2015; Opposition due March 27, 2015; Reply due April 3, 2015. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 INTERIM ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 137 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 155 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER RULE 23(b)(3) (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER setting briefing schedule on Motion for Reconsideration re: Class certification. Plaintiff's motion due August 29, 2014; defendant's opposition due September 12, 2014. Motion to be decided on the papers. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on August 14 2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER 98 Continuing Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/13/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER 66 Continuing Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/12/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER 61 of Litigation Schedule: Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/27/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Dismiss or Strike.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER 50 Continuing Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/17/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER 15 Selecting ADR Process. Case Referred to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/3/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER 16 Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/16/2012. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanovaz v. Twinings North America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lanovaz
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twinings North America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?