Sprint Nextel Corporation v. Ngo
Plaintiff: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Defendant: Thuc Ngo
Case Number: 5:2012cv02764
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING 75 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Laporte for Report and Recommendation re 75 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Awarding Damages Against Defendant Thuc Ngo D/B/A Tony Buy iPhone. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/27/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER STRIKING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOSEPH S. BELICHICK re ([64-1] and [66-1]). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/29/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIALS RE: SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/30/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE 38 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REGARDING DEFAULT AND VACATING JULY 19, 2012 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on July 5, 2012. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Purposes re 18 MOTION for Expedited Discovery, and 19 MOTION To Preserve Evidence. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/13/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Nextel Corporation v. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thuc Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Belichick
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Represented By: M. Derek Harris
Represented By: Stacey Kim Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?