Verona v. Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.

Defendant: Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bradley Verona
Case Number: 5:2012cv02956
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 22 Stipulation Re Dismissal With Prejudice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 9, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/09/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 4, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Strike. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/04/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verona v. Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford Korey Newman
Represented By: Shannon S. Pierce
Represented By: Stephen N. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Verona
Represented By: Thomas E. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?