Harrold et al v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Harrold and Alyson Harrold
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union , LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2012cv02987
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 55 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 47 Notice (Other) filed by Douglas Harrold, Alyson Harrold]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/28/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 28 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrold et al v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Harrold
Represented By: Anita Louise Steburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyson Harrold
Represented By: Anita Louise Steburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union , LLC
Represented By: Monica Katz-Lapides
Represented By: William R. Brown
Represented By: Andrew Michael Lehmann
Represented By: Robert J. Schuckit
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kalama M. Lui-Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?