Sunnyvale Imaging Center v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sunnyvale Imaging Center
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv03404
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(2) (granting 73 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/20/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE (amending 65 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DECLINING TO APPROVE 61 JOINT STIPULATION SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/28/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/5/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 44 Proposed Order filed by MedSolutions, Inc. Counsel to arrange telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/26/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/22/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 37 Notice (Other) filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/21/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE: FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/17/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 08/27/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 25 Statement filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/26/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 08/22/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 12, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 7, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 11, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunnyvale Imaging Center v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunnyvale Imaging Center
Represented By: James Michael Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Adrienne Clare Publicover
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?