Jachetta v. Capio Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jachetta
Defendant: Capio Partners, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv03410
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 26 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 11 Stipulation selecting Mediation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jachetta v. Capio Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jachetta
Represented By: Ronald Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capio Partners, LLC
Represented By: Keren E Gesund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?