J.C. v. Cambrian School District et al
Plaintiff: J. C.
Defendant: Cambrian School District, Fammatre Charter Elementary School, Kristi Schwiebert, Randy Scofield and Deborah Blow
Case Number: 5:2012cv03513
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The defendants are entitled to judgment as a matter of law. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/02/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER CONCERNING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. The parties should complete the discovery allowed at the earliest possible time. Further, the parties should stipulate to a hearing date that allows plaintiffs to respond on the merits rather than to seek a continuance until they have obtained said discovery. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/22/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/5/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re 22 filed by Fammatre Charter Elementary School, Cambrian School District, Kristi Schwiebert, Randy Scofield, Deborah Blow. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 To Extend Deadline For Completion of Mediation filed by Fammatre Charter Elementary School, Cambrian School District, Kristi Schwiebert, Deborah Blow, J. C. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 5/30/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012). Copy mailed to plaintiff counsel. Modified on 9/21/2012 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.C. v. Cambrian School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Represented By: David H. Tollner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambrian School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fammatre Charter Elementary School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Schwiebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Blow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?