Pennix v. IAP World Services
Plaintiff: Tyrone A Pennix
Defendant: IAP World Services
Case Number: 5:2012cv03520
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 08/20/13. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re [21-1] Request to appear telelphonically filed by IAP World Services. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/12/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 19 Stipulation to Extend Pretrial Deadlines and Trial.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Plaintiff's State Law Claims.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION, granting 15 Stipulation filed by IAP World Services. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/5/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennix v. IAP World Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone A Pennix
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAP World Services
Represented By: Krystal Noel LoPilato
Represented By: Erica Kristen Rocush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?