Long et al v. Nationwide Legal File and Serve, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Grady Vernon Long, Ismail Isa and Warren Jeremiah Spies
Defendant: Nationwide Legal File and Serve, Inc, Nationwide Legal, LLC, Caesar Eric Railey and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2012cv03578
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Attorney Fees (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/20/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/14/14. (lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER entering judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/21/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/15/2013. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/11/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER to file status report. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/27/2013. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 51 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Summary Judgment (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 38 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 30 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 INTERIM ORDER re 30 Discovery Dispute Report #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/3/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 15, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long et al v. Nationwide Legal File and Serve, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady Vernon Long
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismail Isa
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Jeremiah Spies
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Legal File and Serve, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Legal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesar Eric Railey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?