Campbell et al v. Hunter Engineering Company
Plaintiff: Tyrone Campbell and Kim Campbell
Defendant: Hunter Engineering Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv03777
Filed: July 18, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: Settlement. The parties having filed a Notice of Settlement, the 7/30/13 Case Management Conference is vacated and all pending motions and deadlines are terminated. Motions terminated: 50 First MOTION to Intervene filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Order to Show Cause Re: Settlement Hearing set for 9/17/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/10/2013. If a dismissal is filed before the response and hearing date, the Show Cause hearing will be automatically vacated and no statement will be required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 25, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference Following Reassignment. Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due 7/23/13. The deadline for the close of Expert Discove ry, currently set for 7/26/13, is vacated until further notice or until it is reset at the Case Management Conference. All other case management deadlines remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 16, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER directing Zurich American Insurance Company to reset the briefing schedule and renotice its motion for an order granting leave to intervene 47 for hearing before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 8, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Directing Proposed Intervenor Zurich American Insurance Company to File Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 24, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Directing Parties to File Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 20, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 26 Interpleader filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 7, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 34 Discovery Letter Briefs 35 . (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Interim Order on Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. The parties are ordered to meet and confer no later than 6/4/13 at 9:00 AM. Discovery Hearing set for 6/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. The parties to participate in the hearing via CourtCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on May 31, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Terminating Discovery Motions. The parties are directed to comply with the undersigned's Standing Order re Civil Discovery Disputes. Motions terminated: 30 First MOTION to Compel IME of Plaintiff Tyrone Campbell by Neurologist Peter C. Cassini, M.D. filed by Hunter Engineering Company, 31 First MOTION to Shorten Time to June 6, 2013 for Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Tyrone Campbell by Neurologist Peter C. Cassini, M.D. and to Shorten Plaintiff's Time to May 31, 2013 to filed by Hunter Engineering Company.. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on May 28, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 27 Stipulation.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on January 24, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. Hunter Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Campbell
Represented By: Jeffrey David Janoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Campbell
Represented By: Jeffrey David Janoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Engineering Company
Represented By: Robert Edmund Davies
Represented By: Gregory Alexander Nelson
Represented By: Mary Alma Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?