Trinh v. Citibank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Trinh
Defendant: Citibank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Bank of America, NA
Case Number: 5:2012cv03902
Filed: July 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS 35 53 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 28, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE. The Clerk of the Court shall reassign this action to an available magistrate judge pursuant to this district's Assignment Plan. All matters scheduled before District Judge Edward J. Davila are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 7 Motion to Strike ; granting 17 Motion to Strike. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 1/4/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/17/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A "CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 10, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinh v. Citibank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Trinh
Represented By: Jeremy J. Alberts
Represented By: Peter N. Osborn
Represented By: Batkhand Zoljargal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?