AF Holding, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: AF Holding, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 5:2012cv04221
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 54 Motion for Attorney Fees.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE for failure to post undertaking. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/30/2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 20 Defendant's Motion to Require Undertaking.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to Continue Hearing on 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/05/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Without Prejudice.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE DISCOVERY REFERENCE TO JUDGE ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/17/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AF Holding, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AF Holding, LLC
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?