Campbell v. Feld Entertainment, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Campbell
Defendant: Feld Entertainment, Inc, James Dennis and Matthew Gillett
Case Number: 5:2012cv04233
Filed: August 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER REGARDING LUNCH FOR JURORS. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 2/24/2015. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/23/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/20/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER RE DX 117. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/19/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (ANNOTATED). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/18/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUESTED RULE 65 INSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/17/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER TO FILE REVISED JOINT LIST OF ADMITTED EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER RULING ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/12/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 FEDERAL INJUNCTION LIMITING INSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/10/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER RE TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/6/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER RE OAKLAND FEDERAL INJUNCTION AND SPECIAL EVENTS PERMIT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/5/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER PERMITTING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 2/3/2015. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/30/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 239 Motion in Limine; granting 240 Motion in Limine; granting 241 Motion in Limine; granting 245 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 246 Motion in Limine; denying 248 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 249 Motion in Limine; denying 250 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 251 Motion in Limine (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE ATTACHMENT TO PROPOSED SUBSTANTIVE JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/16/2015. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Re Discovery Dispute Joint Report #7-9 182 183 184 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/12/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/6/2015. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 234 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and granting summary judgment as to defendant Bailey (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 188 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 216 Motion for Leave to File; denying 221 Motion for Sanctions (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/5/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 179 Motion (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER re 160 First Discovery Letter Brief(Ennis 1), 162 Second Discovery Letter Brief(Campbell Dispute Re Interrogatories), 163 Third Discovery Letter Brief(Dispute Re Subpoena on Cuviello), 165 Fourth Discover y Letter Brief(Campbell Dispute Re Production), 166 Fifth Discovery Letter Brief(Dispute Re Subpoena on Other Parties), 177 DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT LETTER REPORT #6 (RE JOINT LETTER #2 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/5/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2014. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/6/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (126) Motion to Dismiss and Strike in case 5:12-cv-04233-LHK (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
February 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Order to Show Cause RE: Federal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/17/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying (121) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 5:12-cv-04233-LHK; denying (46) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 5:13-cv-00233-LHK. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO JUDGE LUCY H. KOH FOR CONSIDERATION OF RELATED CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/28/2014. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part (94) Motion to Dismiss; denying (110) Motion to Amend/Correct ; in case 5:12-cv-04233-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF SHANNON CAMPBELL'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT 110 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/12/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re (24 in 5:13-cv-00233-LHK) Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Ennis, (74 in 5:12-cv-04233-LHK) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shannon Campbell. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 22, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Re: Consolidation; Continuing Case Management Conference; Vacating Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/18/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Re Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/13/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 32 Motion to Relate Case; granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief and/or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended C ; denying 8 Motion to Transfer Case Responses due by 3/1/2013. Replies due by 3/8/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Feld Entertainment, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Campbell
Represented By: G. Whitney Leigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feld Entertainment, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?