Neys v. Mayo et al
Plaintiff: Semyon Neys
Defendant: Mayo, Forde and Ng
Case Number: 5:2012cv04241
Filed: August 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 31 Motion ; denying 32 Motion ; denying 33 Motion to Compel; granting 34 Motion (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, two copies of the Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the complaint, (Docket No. 1), all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon Defendants Mayo, Forde, and Ng of the San Francisco County Sheriff's Department at the Sheriff's Department, City Hall, Room 456 (1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place, San Francisco, CA 94102). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neys v. Mayo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semyon Neys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?