Cabrera v. Oh
Plaintiff: Juan Torres Cabrera
Defendant: Christopher Hanbum Oh
Case Number: 5:2012cv04294
Filed: August 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending Motion for Default Judgment, the court finds that a scheduling conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 7/19/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/11/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 10 defendant's Answer Be Stricken. Objections due by 5/7/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/23/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant's Answer Should Not Be Stricken. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/19/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/15/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant's Answer Should Not Be Stricken. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/15/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/19/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (1) conditionally granting 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; and (2) re-setting initial case management conference. 12/11/2012 motion hearing vacated. Motion to withdraw granted subject to condition that papers may be continue to be served on counsel for forwarding purposes, unless and until defendant appears by other counsel or pro se. Initial case management conference set for 12/18/2012, 1:30 PM.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Vacating November 6, 2012 Initial Case Management Conference. Conference to be re-set by the court as necessary after pending motion to withdraw is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/6/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera v. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Torres Cabrera
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hanbum Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?