Starr v. Alameda County Jail
Plaintiff: Shannon Lee Starr
Defendant: Alameda County Jail
Case Number: 5:2012cv04400
Filed: August 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 163 of Dismissal filed by Shannon Lee Starr. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order Granting Leave to Amend to Add Corizon Health, Inc. as Defendant. (Re: 113 , 118 ). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/24/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte Regarding 113 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Corizon Health, Inc. By June 24, 2016, defendant shall file a response in accordance with this order, not to exceed 12 pages. By July 5, 2016, plaintiff shall file a response to defendant's submission, not to exceed 12 pages. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/13/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference, Status Conference and Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 4/17/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 4/14/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting in Part and Denying in Part 52 Medical Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 53 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Medical Records; Granting 54 County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; REFERRING CASE to Pro Se Prisoner Settlement Program. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 31 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition as to 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Opposition due by 6/30/2014. Replies due by 7/14/2014. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Motion for Reconsideration. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL; ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION. Habeas Answer due by 12/23/2013. Dispositive Motion due by 1/23/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 26 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Request for Leave to Amend. Amended Complaint Due by 6/13/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/13/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time; Denying Motion for Reconsideration. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Dismissal With Leave to Amend; Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr v. Alameda County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Lee Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?