Park Townsend, LLC et al v. Clarendon America Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Park Townsend, LLC, GKB Development Co, LLC, Warren L. Breslow Trust and Warren L. Breslow
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv04412
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Clarendon is required to E-FILE the amended document; granting in part and staying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
May 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 35 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines and Amend Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaim.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Regarding Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/22/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 9 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park Townsend, LLC et al v. Clarendon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Townsend, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Louis Oliva
Represented By: Thomas Eben Ladegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GKB Development Co, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Louis Oliva
Represented By: Thomas Eben Ladegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren L. Breslow Trust
Represented By: Thomas Eben Ladegaard
Represented By: Joseph Louis Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren L. Breslow
Represented By: Thomas Eben Ladegaard
Represented By: Joseph Louis Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Chi Chau
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?