Spitters et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co et al
Plaintiff: |
Pajaro Dunes Rental Agency, Inc. and Laurence L. Spitters |
Defendant: |
JPMorgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive |
Case Number: |
5:2012cv04429 |
Filed: |
August 23, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
County: |
Santa Cruz |
Presiding Judge: |
Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 9, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause, Vacating Compliance Hearing and DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/9/2013. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing
44
ORDER (1) CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING Compliance Hearing continued to 8/16/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Order to Show Cause Hearing continued to 8/16/2013 09:01 AM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/19/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
|
June 21, 2013 |
Filing
40
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; AND SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/19/2013 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/12/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/21/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
|
April 19, 2013 |
Filing
38
ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 6/21/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/19/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER, Motions terminated: 25 Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Extension to File Opposition; and for Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Pajaro Dunes Ren tal Agency, Inc., Laurence L. Spitters., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Extension to File Opposition; and for Order Continuing Case Management Con ference, 15 MOTION to Dismiss. Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2013 02:00 PM. Responses due by 1/31/2013. Replies due by 2/7/2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS on 1/3/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
|
November 16, 2012 |
Filing
18
ORDER REGARDING FAILURE TO FILE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/16/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
|
September 17, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/17/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
|
September 14, 2012 |
Filing
12
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/14/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?