Bhandari et al v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Narpat Bhandari and Chandra Bhandari
Defendant: Capital One, N.A., T.D. Service Company, Chevy Chase Bank, FSB and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv04533
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 88 Motion to Dismiss; granting 91 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/27/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 65 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART 56 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO AMEND by Judge Paul S. Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/7/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS AND ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION, re 54 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Narpat Bhandari: Mahesh Kumar Bajoria, Reuben Lagbao Nocos and Najeeb U. Kudiya are discharged as counsel for plaintiffs. Gary Sullivan, and Glen L. Moss of Moss & Murphy are approved as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/3/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 15 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPEARANCE AT 12/18/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY COURT CALL, re 49 Notice (Other) filed by Narpat Bhandari: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/17/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 37 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Narpat Bhandari. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 21, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/13/2012 Case Management Conference reset to 12/18/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/6/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 6 Motion for TRO; granting 7 Motion for TRO (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhandari et al v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narpat Bhandari
Represented By: Mahesh Kumar Bajoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Bhandari
Represented By: Mahesh Kumar Bajoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Evelina Manukyan
Represented By: Sunny S. Huo
Represented By: Andrew Weiss Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevy Chase Bank, FSB
Represented By: Sunny S. Huo
Represented By: Evelina Manukyan
Represented By: Andrew Weiss Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Sunny S. Huo
Represented By: Evelina Manukyan
Represented By: Andrew Weiss Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?