Farahani v. Floria et al
Plaintiff: Fred Farmahin Farahani
Defendant: Ronald A. Floria, Adolfo Salazar and PLM Lender Services
Case Number: 5:2012cv04637
Filed: September 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER setting deadlines for opposition and reply to motion to dismiss re 79 Order, 73 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendant Ronald Floria under FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Ronald A. Floria. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 28, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Re: Withdrawal of Counsel CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 70 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 7, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (lhklc2, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 49 Motion of Malicious Abuses of Process.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; denying 32 Ex Parte Motion Constructive Trust, Malicious Abuse of Process, Change of Venue; denying 34 Ex Parte Application for Emergency Hearing; denying 35 Motion for One-on-One Appointment with Judge (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/5/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh declining to dismiss case for failure to prosecute; setting new briefing schedule; and finding as moot 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 4 Ex Parte Application (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farahani v. Floria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Floria
Represented By: Benjamin Rafael Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLM Lender Services
Represented By: Phillip Mark Adleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Farmahin Farahani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?