Abdelfattah v. Carringhton Mortgage Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Ahmed Abdelfattah
Defendant: Carringhton Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv04656
Filed: September 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER 59 to Stay the Case. Case Stayed. Case Management Conference Re: Settlement set for 12/5/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose or File a Dismissal by 12/1/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER 55 Regarding Stipulation to Stay the Case for 60 Days and Appoint a Magistrate Judge for Purposes of Conducting a Settlement Conference. Case Stayed for 60 Days and is Referred to Magistrate Judge Lloyd for Settlement Conference. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Ronald M. Whyte in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/7/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER 48 Enlarging TIme to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/13/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER 46 Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motions terminated: 43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Ahmed Abdelfattah, 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Carringhton Mortgage Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/17/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER 40 Granting Notice of Substitution of Firms. Attorney Donna L. Wilson, John W. McGuinness, Brandon P. Reilly with the Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP Firm for Carringhton Mortgage Services, LLC added. Attorney Donna Lynne Wilson; John William McGuinness and Brandon P Reilly with the BuckleySandler LLP Firm Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 35 Motion to Strike.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER 34 to Continue Briefing Schedule on Carrington Mortgage's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER 28 to Continue Case Management Deadlines and Initial Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/12/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER 21 Enlarging Time for Briefing Schedule for Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/19/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER 17 to Take Motion to Dismiss Off Calendar, to Set Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint, and to Continue Case Management Deadlines and Initial Case Management ConferenceA: Motions terminated: Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/15/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER 5 Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint and Changing Initial Case Scheduling Order. Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/11/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdelfattah v. Carringhton Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Abdelfattah
Represented By: William Eric Kennedy
Represented By: Tyler Hinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carringhton Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Brandon P Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?